Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luís Raimundo da Silva Brito

Deceased

Archbishop of Olinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1840BornSão Bento de Perís
28 Sep 186222.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Jun 186423.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 190160.5AppointedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
5 May 190160.7Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
5 Dec 191070.3AppointedArchbishop of Olinda, Brazil
9 Dec 191575.3DiedArchbishop of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luís Raimundo da Silva Brito:
Archbishop Luís Raimundo da Silva Brito (born , died ) Archbishop of Olinda

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 424
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013