Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Irineu Joffily (Joffly)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Anasartha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1878Born
17 Feb 190122.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Aug 191436.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olinda, Brazil
18 Aug 191436.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufetula
13 Jun 191537.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufetula
4 May 191637.9AppointedBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
15 Oct 191638.3InstalledBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
27 Mar 192445.8AppointedArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
23 Jan 192546.6InstalledArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
1 May 193152.9ResignedArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
1 May 193152.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anasartha
25 Apr 195071.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Irineu Joffily (Joffly)
Archbishop João Irineu Joffily (Joffly) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampina Grande

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 51
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1915, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast