Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antônio de Oliveira Lopes

Deceased

Bishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1868Born
16 Apr 189224.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 191547.2AppointedBishop of Floresta, Brazil
21 Nov 191547.6Ordained BishopBishop of Floresta, Brazil
24 Nov 193264.6DiedBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Antônio de Oliveira Lopes
Bishop José Antônio de Oliveira Lopes (born , died ) Bishop of Pesqueira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecife

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018