Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Manaus

Archidioecesis Manaënsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Sérgio Eduardo Castriani, C.S.Sp., Archbishop
  • Mário Antônio da Silva, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Luiz Soares Vieira, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Mário Pasqualotto, P.I.M.E., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 February 1952
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Amazonas
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 64,079 (24,750 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte I
  • Web Site: http://missaooasis.net/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Av. Joaquim Nabuco 1023, 69020-030 Manaus, AM, Brazil
  • Telephone: (092)3212-9010/1
  • Fax: 3212-9012

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Amazonas
27 April 1892ErectedDiocese of Belém do Pará Diocese of Amazonas (erected)
15 August 1907Territory LostDiocese of Amazonas
Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Territorial Abbey of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro (erected)
23 May 1910Territory LostDiocese of Amazonas Prefecture Apostolic of Alto Solimões (erected)
23 May 1910Territory LostDiocese of Amazonas Prefecture Apostolic of Tefé (erected)
15 December 1915Territory LostDiocese of Amazonas Diocese of Caratinga (erected)
4 October 1919Territory LostDiocese of Amazonas Territorial Prelature of Acre e Purus (erected)
1 May 1925Territory LostDiocese of Amazonas
Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres
Territorial Prelature of Porto Velho (erected)
1 May 1925Territory LostDiocese of Amazonas Territorial Prelature of Lábrea (erected)
Archdiocese of Manaus
16 February 1952ElevatedDiocese of Amazonas Archdiocese of Manaus
12 July 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Manaus Territorial Prelature of Parintins (erected)
26 June 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Manaus
Territorial Prelature of Porto Velho
Territorial Prelature of Humaitá (erected)
13 July 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Manaus
Territorial Prelature of Parintins
Territorial Prelature of Borba (erected)
13 July 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Manaus Territorial Prelature of Coari (erected)
13 July 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Manaus Territorial Prelature of Itacoatiara (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Amazonas
1950281,000310,00090.6%1353664,2575512621ap1951
Archdiocese of Manaus
1964219,555243,95090.0%1836544,0654115512ap1967
1968295,085316,46693.2%1142535,5675423112ap1971
1976456,950571,25080.0%1364775,9349917522ap1977
1977602,440753,05080.0%2151728,3677716429ap1981
1990936,0001,178,00079.5%1683999,454116614351ap1991
19991,137,6851,300,00087.5%357511010,3428513352ap2000
20001,483,2501,900,00078.1%52409216,1229715252ap2001
20011,300,0001,600,00081.3%428312510,4009517152ap2002
20021,200,0001,405,83585.4%40831239,7569517152ap2003
20031,200,0001,405,83585.4%39831229,8369517153ap2004
20041,200,0001,405,83585.4%42831259,60039517153ap2005
20111,331,0001,551,00085.8%481151638,1651612717182ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 17 Jul 2013