Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basilio Manuel Olimpio Pereira, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amazonas

Titular Bishop of Lipara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1871BornVila Velha de Minas do Rio das Contas
27 Oct 189524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1 May 192554.0AppointedBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
25 Oct 192554.5Ordained BishopBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
22 Mar 194169.9ResignedBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
22 Mar 194169.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lipara
30 Sep 194877.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Basilio Manuel Olimpio Pereira:
Bishop Basilio Manuel Olimpio Pereira O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amazonas

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013