Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Floréncio Cicinho (Sisinio) Vieira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amargosa, Baia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1901BornJiquiriçá
30 Nov 192322.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 194240.9AppointedBishop of Amargosa, Baia, Brazil
2 Aug 194241.2Ordained BishopBishop of Amargosa, Baia, Brazil
11 Jan 196967.7ResignedBishop of Amargosa, Baia, Brazil
11 Jan 196967.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Macomades Rusticiana
16 Mar 197169.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Macomades Rusticiana
2 Oct 199493.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Amargosa, Baia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Floréncio Cicinho (Sisinio) Vieira:
Bishop Floréncio Cicinho (Sisinio) Vieira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amargosa

  • a priest for 70.8 years
  • a bishop for 52.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013