Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jairo Rui Matos da Silva

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1929Born
8 Dec 195425.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 197444.5AppointedBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
5 May 197444.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
26 Jul 200677.0RetiredBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
12 Jan 200777.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jairo Rui Matos da Silva
Bishop Jairo Rui Matos da Silva (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bonfim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastro Alves

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2006
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018