Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alair Vilar Fernandes de Melo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1916Born
19 Nov 193923.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 197053.7AppointedBishop of Amargosa, Bahia, Brazil
17 May 197053.9Ordained BishopBishop of Amargosa, Bahia, Brazil
6 Apr 198871.8AppointedArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
27 Oct 199377.3RetiredArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
20 Aug 199983.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alair Vilar Fernandes de Melo
Archbishop Alair Vilar Fernandes de Melo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Natal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNatal, Archdiocese of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte
Ordained BishopSt. Pierre de Alecrim, Church, Natal, Archdiocese of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 504

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast