Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Tavares de Araújo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1912Born
25 Oct 193624.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 195946.5AppointedBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
5 Apr 195946.7Ordained BishopBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
29 Mar 197865.7ResignedBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
18 Feb 200693.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Tavares de Araújo
Bishop Manuel Tavares de Araújo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caicó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão José de Mipibu

  • a priest for 69.3 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 25
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018