Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nivaldo Monte

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1918Born
12 Jan 194223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
25 Apr 196345.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
25 Apr 196345.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Eluza
21 Jul 196345.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eluza
8 May 196547.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
6 Sep 196749.4AppointedArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
6 Apr 198870.0RetiredArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
10 Nov 200688.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Nivaldo Monte
Archbishop Nivaldo Monte (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Natal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNatal

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast