Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Amargosa

Dioecesis Amargosensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 10 May 1941
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Bahia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 13,972 (5,396 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste III
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Avenida Lomanto Junior 11, 45300-000 Amargosa, BA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (075) 3634-1176
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10 May 1941ErectedArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia Diocese of Amargosa (erected)
27 July 1957Territory LostDiocese of Amargosa Diocese of Vitória da Conquista (erected)
7 November 1978Territory LostDiocese of Amargosa
Diocese of Vitória da Conquista
Diocese of Jequié (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950700,000720,00097.2%2052528,00042530ap1951
1959440,000450,00097.8%2062616,92363122ap1960
1964467,000487,58895.8%1882617,96186023ap1967
1970480,000500,00096.0%1872519,20073522ap1971
1976488,000535,00091.2%1862420,33364324ap1977
1980400,000410,21397.5%13122516,000122625ap1981
1990503,000526,00095.6%1792619,34693023ap1991
1999584,000608,00096.1%2152622,46164324ap2000
2000592,000616,00096.1%2352821,14264324ap2001
2001530,000552,04296.0%2362918,27573124ap2002
2002537,000560,00095.9%2352819,17872824ap2003
2003537,000552,04297.3%2663216,78182724ap2004
2004537,000552,04297.3%2463017,90082724ap2005
2006551,000567,00097.2%2452919,00062724ap2007
2012608,000629,00096.7%2563119,61273826ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014