Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Santos Cardoso

Bishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1961 BornDário Meira
27 Dec 198625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil
14 Dec 201150.0AppointedBishop of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
12 Feb 201250.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
17 Mar 201250.2InstalledBishop of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
24 Jun 201553.5AppointedBishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Santos Cardoso:
Bishop João Santos Cardoso (born ) Bishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bom Jesus da Lapa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2011
  • c1: CB, 14 Dec 2011
  • ob/i: CB, 12 Jan 2012
  • c2+: CB, 16 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,261
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 24 Jun 2015