Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Roberto Silva Carvalho

Bishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1960 Born
9 Jul 199535.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil
26 Oct 201656.5AppointedBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
29 Jan 201756.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Roberto Silva Carvalho
Bishop José Roberto Silva Carvalho (born ) Bishop of Caetité

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFortaleza
Ordained BishopPlaza in front of Senhora Santana, Cathedral, Caetité, Diocese of Caetité, Bahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caetité.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2016
  • ob: CB, 26 Oct 2016
  • c2: CB, 2 Dec 2016
  • c34: CB, 11 Dec 2016
  • c3: CB, 14 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017