Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
20 October 1913 | Erected | Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia | Diocese of Barra (do Rio Grande) (erected)
Diocese of Caetité (erected) Diocese of Ilhéus (erected) |
14 November 1959 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Amargosa (Parts of Andaraí)
Diocese of Barra (do Rio Grande) (Seabra) Diocese of Bonfim (Ireoê, Miguel Calmon, Morro do Chapéu, and Utinga) Diocese of Caetité (Lencóis, Palmeiras, and parts of Andaraí) Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia (Baixa Grande, Ipirá, Ibiquera, Itaberaba, Macajuba, Mairi, Mundo Novo, Piritiba, and Rui Barbosa) | Diocese of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa) (erected) |
22 July 1962 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Barra (do Rio Grande) (Oarinhanha, Cocos, Coribe, Correntina, Paratinga, Santa Maria da Vitoria, Santana, and Portions of Bom Iesus da Lapa)
Diocese of Caetité (Portions of Bom Iesus da Lapa) | Diocese of Bom Jesus da Lapa (erected) |
27 February 1967 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Caetité (Abaira, Agua Quente, Barra da Estiva, Boninal, Contendas do Sincorá, Dom Basilio, Ibicoara, Ibitiara, Ibipitanga, Iramaia, Ituaçu, Jussiapé, Livramento de Nossa Senhora, Mucugê, Paramirim, Piata, Rio de Contas, Rio do Pires, and Tanhaçu) | Diocese of Livramento de Nossa Senhora (erected) |
16 January 2002 | Metropolitan Changed | Diocese of Caetité (from Sao Salvador da Bahia) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1950 | 443,762 | .0% | 20 | 20 | 0 | 3 | 23 | ap1951 | ||||
1959 | 500,000 | 600,000 | 83.3% | 17 | 17 | 29,411 | 4 | 24 | ap1960 | |||
1965 | 800,000 | 820,000 | 97.6% | 20 | 20 | 40,000 | 5 | 46 | ap1967 | |||
1970 | 480,000 | 500,000 | 96.0% | 27 | ap1971 | |||||||
1976 | 495,000 | 500,000 | 99.0% | 15 | 15 | 33,000 | 15 | 27 | ap1977 | |||
1980 | 540,000 | 550,000 | 98.2% | 14 | 2 | 16 | 33,750 | 2 | 14 | 27 | ap1981 | |
1990 | 573,000 | 600,000 | 95.5% | 18 | 3 | 21 | 27,285 | 3 | 34 | 28 | ap1991 | |
1999 | 640,000 | 700,000 | 91.4% | 16 | 5 | 21 | 30,476 | 5 | 40 | 30 | ap2000 | |
2000 | 630,000 | 700,000 | 90.0% | 19 | 6 | 25 | 25,200 | 6 | 42 | 31 | ap2001 | |
2001 | 637,000 | 708,000 | 90.0% | 23 | 8 | 31 | 20,548 | 8 | 42 | 32 | ap2002 | |
2002 | 560,000 | 700,000 | 80.0% | 15 | 8 | 23 | 24,347 | 8 | 42 | 33 | ap2003 | |
2003 | 630,000 | 700,000 | 90.0% | 19 | 7 | 26 | 24,230 | 7 | 42 | 33 | ap2004 | |
2004 | 618,351 | 678,221 | 91.2% | 28 | 7 | 35 | 17,667 | 8 | 48 | 45 | ap2005 | |
2006 | 618,351 | 678,221 | 91.2% | 30 | 5 | 35 | 17,667 | 5 | 46 | 33 | ap2007 | |
2012 | 660,000 | 723,000 | 91.3% | 30 | 8 | 38 | 17,368 | 8 | 32 | 33 | ap2013 | |
2013 | 665,000 | 729,000 | 91.2% | 31 | 7 | 38 | 17,500 | 9 | 34 | 33 | ap2014 | |
2016 | 656,000 | 718,855 | 91.3% | 29 | 7 | 36 | 18,222 | 7 | 24 | 33 | ap2017 | |
2019 | 654,529 | 736,220 | 88.9% | 33 | 7 | 40 | 16,363 | 8 | 21 | 38 | ap2020 | |
2021 | 635,425 | 788,651 | 80.6% | 37 | 9 | 46 | 13,813 | 23 | 14 | 38 | ap2022 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 7 Aug 2023 |
✠