Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eliseu Maria Gomes de Oliveira, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Itabuna, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1920BornJoão Pessoa
17 Sep 194424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
3 Feb 196847.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
3 Feb 196847.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tituli in Numidia
19 Mar 196847.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tituli in Numidia
5 Feb 197453.4AppointedBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
24 Sep 198060.0AppointedBishop of Itabuna, Bahia, Brazil
20 Jul 198362.9ResignedBishop of Itabuna, Bahia, Brazil
11 Feb 200281.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Itabuna, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eliseu Maria Gomes de Oliveira:
Bishop Eliseu Maria Gomes de Oliveira O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Itabuna

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014