Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Paracatu

Dioecesis Paracatuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 April 1962
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Montes Claros
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 54,387 (21,006 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centro-Oeste
  • Official Web Site: http://dioceseparacatu.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 30, Rua Alexandre Silva 247, 38600-000 Paracatu, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (038) 671-1620

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Paracatu
1 March 1929ErectedDiocese of Montes Claros
Diocese of Uberaba
Territorial Prelature of Paracatu (erected)
15 June 1957Territory LostDiocese of Montes Claros
Territorial Prelature of Paracatu
Diocese of Januária (erected)
Diocese of Paracatu
14 April 1962ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Paracatu Diocese of Paracatu
25 April 2001Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Paracatu (from Brasilia)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Paracatu
195080,00080,000100.0%8810,000846ap1951
Diocese of Paracatu
1965170,000148,000114.9%141412,1421477ap1967
1970170,000180,00094.4%111115,45412107ap1971
1976172,000182,04494.5%111115,63611188ap1977
1977188,000225,00083.6%2121413,428121410ap1981
1990238,000265,00089.8%581318,3078149ap1991
1999234,000300,00078.0%216278,666161013ap2000
2000234,000300,00078.0%177249,75097715ap2001
2001234,000300,00078.0%1582310,17388515ap2002
2002234,000300,00078.0%198278,66688515ap2003
2003234,000300,00078.0%237307,800971015ap2004
2004234,000300,00078.0%247317,54897816ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014