Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimundo Luí, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paracatu, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1912BornItú
8 Dec 193927.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
11 Jun 196249.8AppointedBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
29 Jul 196250.0Ordained BishopBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Aug 196250.0InstalledBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
20 Jul 197764.9ResignedBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 Aug 199482.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Raimundo Luí:
Bishop Raimundo Luí O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paracatu

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 111
  • c1: Website of the Diocese, 27 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015