Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Cardoso Sobrinho, O. Carm.

Archbishop Emeritus of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1933 Born
15 Oct 195421.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
28 Apr 195723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
29 Mar 197945.7AppointedBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
27 May 197945.9Ordained BishopBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
15 Aug 197946.1InstalledBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
2 Apr 198551.7AppointedArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
1 Jul 200976.0RetiredArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary
José Cardoso Sobrinho
Archbishop José Cardoso Sobrinho O. Carm.
(born )
Archbishop Emeritus of Olinda e Recife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaruaru
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Relatives
Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,917

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025