Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valério Breda, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1945Born
29 Jun 197328.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Jul 199752.5AppointedBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
19 Oct 199752.7Ordained BishopBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
16 Jun 202075.3DiedBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Valério Breda
Bishop Valério Breda S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Penedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Fior di Sooto
Ordained BishopColégio Salesiano Sagrado Coracão, Recife, Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco
Death PlaceMemorial Arthur Ramos, Hospital, Maceió, Archdiocese of Maceió, Alagoas

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,162
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 16 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Jun 2020

Quantcast