Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedito Gonçalves dos Santos

Bishop of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1958 Born
8 Dec 199032.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Apr 200849.8AppointedBishop of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 Jul 200850.0Ordained BishopBishop of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Aug 200850.1InstalledBishop of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Benedito Gonçalves dos Santos
Bishop Benedito Gonçalves dos Santos (born ) Bishop of Presidente Prudente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParacatu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Presidente Prudente.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2008
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,778

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018