Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geraldo Majela Reis

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1924Born
27 Nov 194925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 Jan 197853.3AppointedBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
30 Mar 197853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
3 Feb 198156.4AppointedArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 May 199772.7RetiredArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
27 May 200479.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Majela Reis
Archbishop Geraldo Majela Reis (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Diamantina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLamim

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018