Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Lázaro Neves, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Assis, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1902BornCampo Belo
19 Dec 192624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
30 Aug 194846.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Aug 194846.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Abari
21 Nov 194846.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abari
12 Feb 195249.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Feb 195653.8SucceededBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Jul 197775.2RetiredBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 May 199189.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Lázaro Neves:
Bishop José Lázaro Neves C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Assis

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013