Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Elias Chaves Júnior, C.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Cametá, Para, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1926Born
18 Oct 195327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
21 May 198054.0AppointedPrelate of Cametá, Para, Brazil
25 Jul 198054.2Ordained BishopPrelate of Cametá, Para, Brazil
29 Sep 199973.4ResignedPrelate of Cametá, Para, Brazil
31 Oct 200680.5DiedPrelate Emeritus of Cametá, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Elias Chaves Júnior
Bishop José Elias Chaves Júnior C.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Cametá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuz

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018