Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio Ribeiro de Oliveira

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1926Born
2 Apr 194922.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Aug 196135.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil
25 Aug 196135.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
29 Oct 196135.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
19 Dec 197549.5AppointedBishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
23 Oct 198559.3AppointedArchbishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil
8 May 200275.9RetiredArchbishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil
28 Feb 201790.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Ribeiro de Oliveira
Archbishop Antônio Ribeiro de Oliveira (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Goiânia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrizona

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 55.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 28 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017