Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Rodrigues de Souza, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Juazeiro, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1926BornParaíba do Sul
2 Feb 194619.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Dec 195024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Dec 197448.7AppointedBishop of Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil
9 Feb 197548.8Ordained BishopBishop of Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil
4 Jun 200377.1RetiredBishop of Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil
9 Sep 201286.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Rodrigues de Souza:
Bishop José Rodrigues de Souza C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Juazeiro

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015