Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Sorocaba

Archidioecesis Sorocabanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 April 1992
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Sao Paulo
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 4,181 (1,614 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul I
  • Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesesorocaba.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Av. Dr. Eugenio Salerno 60, Santa Terezinha, 18035-430 Sorocaba, SP, Brazil
  • Telephone: (015)3221-6880
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Sorocaba
4 July 1924ErectedDiocese of Botucatu
Archdiocese of São Paulo
Diocese of Taubaté
Diocese of Sorocaba (erected)
2 March 1968Territory LostArchdiocese of Botucatu
Diocese of Sorocaba
Diocese of Santos
Diocese of Itapeva (erected)
Archdiocese of Sorocaba
29 April 1992ElevatedDiocese of Sorocaba Archdiocese of Sorocaba
15 April 1998Territory LostDiocese of Itapeva
Archdiocese of Sorocaba
Diocese of Itapetininga (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sorocaba
1950453,000455,00099.6%1828469,8472816832ap1951
1966650,000800,00081.3%5442966,7708630541ap1967
1967656,916.0%422567025227ap1971
1976450,000500,00090.0%3639756,000124418038ap1977
1977544,000605,00089.9%3529648,500153718040ap1981
1990636,000775,00082.1%4524699,217163117442ap1991
Archdiocese of Sorocaba
1999526,155754,50869.7%33124511,692211313633ap2000
2000569,373813,39170.0%37145111,164271514236ap2001
2001604,730864,90169.9%40145411,198341717454ap2002
2002615,148878,78470.0%41145511,184362115758ap2003
2003632,587903,69670.0%40155511,501341813742ap2004
2004654,789935,41470.0%42145611,692391914742ap2005
2010666,000952,00070.0%73401135,8934210415248ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 30 Sep 2012