Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduardo Benes de Sales Rodrigues

Archbishop Emeritus of Sorocaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1941 Born
13 Dec 196423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 Mar 199856.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
11 Mar 199856.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
21 Jun 199856.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
10 Jan 200159.5AppointedBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Mar 200159.7InstalledBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
4 May 200563.8AppointedArchbishop of Sorocaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Dec 201675.5RetiredArchbishop of Sorocaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Benes de Sales Rodrigues
Archbishop Eduardo Benes de Sales Rodrigues (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sorocaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBias Fortes

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sorocaba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,343
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016