Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Itapeva

Dioecesis Itapevensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 2 March 1968
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Sorocaba
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Sao Paulo
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 14,182 (5,477 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul I
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseitapeva.com.br/
  • Mailing Address: Rua Coronel Crescencio 311, 18400-140 Itapeva, SP, Brazil
  • Telephone: (015)3522-0015
  • Fax: 3522-2710

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
2 March 1968ErectedArchdiocese of Botucatu
Diocese of Sorocaba
Diocese of Santos
Diocese of Itapeva (erected)
19 January 1974Territory LostDiocese of Itapeva
Diocese of Santos
Diocese of Registro (erected)
15 April 1998Territory LostDiocese of Itapeva
Archdiocese of Sorocaba
Diocese of Itapetininga (erected)
30 December 1998Territory LostDiocese of Assis
Archdiocese of Botucatu
Diocese of Itapeva
Diocese of Ourinhos (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1968240,000270,00088.9%1016269,230556512ap1971
1976290,000320,00090.6%1119309,6663333519ap1977
1977333,000381,00087.4%9223110,7413383920ap1981
1990346,000450,00076.9%16112712,8144214522ap1991
1999324,000397,46881.5%1539546,0001502921ap2000
2000350,000377,97792.6%1339526,7301572419ap2001
2001270,000391,10969.0%1439535,094572419ap2002
2002350,000391,10089.5%1439536,603572419ap2003
2003370,000458,00080.8%1411524,666192419ap2004
2004240,000391,10961.4%1411516,0001192719ap2005
2006253,000401,00063.1%1711289,035272719ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013