Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Moreira de Melo

Bishop Emeritus of Itapeva, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1941 BornSerra do Salitre
27 Jan 196826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
17 Jan 199654.4AppointedBishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Mar 199654.6Ordained BishopBishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Oct 201675.2RetiredBishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Moreira de Melo
Bishop José Moreira de Melo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Itapeva

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itapeva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,699
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Oct 2016