Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedito de Ulhôa Vieira

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Uberaba, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1920BornMococa
8 Dec 194828.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 197151.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
29 Nov 197151.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bitettum
25 Jan 197251.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bitettum
14 Jul 197857.7AppointedArchbishop of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Feb 199675.3RetiredArchbishop of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 Aug 201493.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Benedito de Ulhôa Vieira:
Archbishop Benedito de Ulhôa Vieira (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Uberaba

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 3 Aug 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015