Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joel Ivo Catapan, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo

Titular Bishop of Macriana Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1927BornTeixeira Soares
19 Mar 195325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
11 Dec 197447.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Dec 197447.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
25 Jan 197547.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
1 May 199971.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joel Ivo Catapan:
Bishop Joel Ivo Catapan S.V.D. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014