Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauro Morelli

Bishop Emeritus of Duque de Caxias, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1935 BornAvanhandava
28 Apr 196529.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 197439.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
12 Dec 197439.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vatarba
25 Jan 197539.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vatarba
25 May 198145.7AppointedBishop of Duque de Caxias, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
30 Mar 200569.5RetiredBishop of Duque de Caxias, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mauro Morelli:
Bishop Mauro Morelli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Duque de Caxias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Duque de Caxias.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013