Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Braz Benevente

Bishop of Jacarezinho, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1961 BornItápolis
7 Dec 198524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Jun 201049.5AppointedBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
7 Sep 201049.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
10 Oct 201049.8InstalledBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Braz Benevente:
Bishop Antônio Braz Benevente (born ) Bishop of Jacarezinho

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jacarezinho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,782

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013