Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mário Antônio da Silva

Bishop of Roraima, Roraima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1966 BornItararé
21 Dec 199125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
9 Jun 201043.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
9 Jun 201043.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arena
20 Aug 201043.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arena
22 Jun 201649.6AppointedBishop of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mário Antônio da Silva
Bishop Mário Antônio da Silva (born ) Bishop of Roraima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roraima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,774
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Jun 2016