Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Albuquerque de Araújo

Auxiliary Bishop of Manaus, Amazonas

Titular Bishop of Altava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1968 BornManaus
1995²26.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
4 Aug 199628.0Ordained PriestPriest of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
16 Mar 201647.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
16 Mar 201647.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Altava
19 Jun 201647.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altava

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Albuquerque de Araújo
Bishop José Albuquerque de Araújo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Manaus

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Manaus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2016
  • od/c1/ob: CB, 16 Mar 2016
  • c2+: CB, 7 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,945

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 Jul 2016