Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mário Pasqualotto, P.I.M.E.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manaus, Amazonas

Titular Bishop of Vicus Caesaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1938 BornValenza Po
26 Jun 196527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
2 Jun 199960.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
2 Jun 199960.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Caesaris
15 Aug 199961.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Caesaris
17 Jul 201375.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mário Pasqualotto:
Bishop Mário Pasqualotto P.I.M.E. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manaus

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Manaus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,597
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013