Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingos Gabriel Wisniewski, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Apucarana, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1928BornGuarani das Missões
29 Jun 195527.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
27 Jun 197547.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
27 Jun 197547.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tela
28 Aug 197547.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tela
19 Apr 197951.1AppointedBishop of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil
17 May 198355.2AppointedBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
2 Feb 200576.9RetiredBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
21 Jul 201082.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Domingos Gabriel Wisniewski:
Bishop Domingos Gabriel Wisniewski C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Apucarana

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013