Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio Maria Mucciolo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1923Born
4 Nov 194926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sorocaba, Brazil
26 May 197754.0AppointedBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Aug 197754.2Ordained BishopBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 May 198966.0AppointedArchbishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Jun 200077.0RetiredArchbishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Sep 201289.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Maria Mucciolo
Archbishop Antônio Maria Mucciolo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Botucatu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel San Lorenzo, Italy
Ordained BishopSorocaba, Diocese of Sorocaba

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 3,020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast