Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Varani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1915BornJaboticabal
23 Dec 193924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Aug 195034.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Aug 195034.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Altava
1 Nov 195035.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altava
7 Feb 196145.3SucceededBishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Jun 198165.6ResignedBishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Jun 199074.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Varani:
Bishop José Varani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jaboticabal

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 93
  • ab/2a79: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 42, Page 829

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013