Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Benedito Cardoso

Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Castellum Minus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1961 Born
14 Mar 198624.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sorocaba, Brazil
23 Nov 198625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sorocaba, Brazil
15 Apr 199836.5IncardinatedPriest of Itapetininga, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Jan 201957.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
23 Jan 201957.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
15 Mar 201957.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus

MicroData Summary for José Benedito Cardoso
Bishop José Benedito Cardoso (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngatuba, Diocese of Sorocaba
Ordained DeaconAngatuba, Diocese of Sorocaba
Ordained PriestSorocaba, Diocese of Sorocaba
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora dos Prazeres, Cathedral, Itapetininga, Diocese of Itapetininga, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Paulo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2019
  • od/ob/c1/loc: CB, 23 Jan 2019
  • c23: CB, 24 Feb 2019
  • c2+: CB, 26 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 15 Mar 2019

Quantcast