Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Almir Marques Ferreira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1911Born
17 Nov 193523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
9 Apr 195745.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
9 Apr 195745.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
5 Aug 195745.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
19 Aug 196149.7AppointedBishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1 Dec 197766.0ResignedBishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1 Jan 198472.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Almir Marques Ferreira
Bishop Almir Marques Ferreira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Uberlândia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePatrocinio

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018