Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Geraldo da Cruz, A.A.

Bishop of Juazeiro, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1941 BornMuriaé
1 May 196927.7Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
4 Jun 200361.8AppointedBishop of Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil
16 Aug 200362.0Ordained BishopBishop of Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil
30 Aug 200362.0InstalledBishop of Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Geraldo da Cruz
Bishop José Geraldo da Cruz A.A. (born ) Bishop of Juazeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Juazeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 May 2016