Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Célio de Oliveira Goulart, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1944Born
2 Feb 196823.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 Jul 196924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Jun 199853.7AppointedBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Aug 199853.9Ordained BishopBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
9 Jul 200358.8AppointedBishop of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil
26 May 201065.6AppointedBishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil
17 Jul 201065.8InstalledBishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Jan 201873.3DiedBishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Célio de Oliveira Goulart
Bishop Célio de Oliveira Goulart O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of São João del Rei

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiracema
Ordained BishopGinásio de Esportes, Pirapora
Death PlaceSão João del Rei, Diocese of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,373
  • d: CB, 19 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Jan 2018