Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diogo Johannes Antonius Reesink, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1934Born
1 Feb 195621.5EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 196025.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jul 196227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Aug 198955.0AppointedBishop of Almenara, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Oct 198955.2Ordained BishopBishop of Almenara, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Mar 199863.6AppointedBishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Nov 200975.3RetiredBishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
30 May 201984.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Diogo Johannes Antonius Reesink
Bishop Diogo Johannes Antonius Reesink O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teófilo Otoni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeerle
Ordained BishopSanatorium, Betim
Death PlaceSanto Antônio, Convent, Divinópolis, Diocese of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais
Buried Place (Original)OFM Provincial, Cemetery, Ribeirão das Neves

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,671
  • d/ente: CB, 30 May 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast