Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arnaldo Ribeiro

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1930BornBelo Horizonte
13 Mar 195424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Nov 197545.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Nov 197545.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
27 Dec 197546.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
28 Dec 198859.0AppointedArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 Apr 200676.2RetiredArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Dec 200979.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Arnaldo Ribeiro:
Archbishop Arnaldo Ribeiro (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ribeirão Preto

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2006
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013