Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Caetano Ferrari, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1942 Born
14 Nov 196927.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
27 Dec 197028.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Apr 200259.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Jul 200259.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Nov 200664.3SucceededBishop of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Apr 200966.7AppointedBishop of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Mar 201875.6RetiredBishop of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Caetano Ferrari
Bishop Caetano Ferrari O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bauru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLins
Ordained BishopGinásio poliesportivo Pedro Murila Fuentes Pedrocão, Franca, Diocese of Franca, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bauru.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,221
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast