Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Belisário da Silva, O.F.M.

Archbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1945 BornCarmópolis de Minas
2 Feb 196923.5Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
13 Dec 196924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1 Dec 199954.3AppointedBishop of Bacabal, Maranho, Brazil
19 Feb 200054.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bacabal, Maranho, Brazil
21 Sep 200560.1AppointedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
19 Nov 200560.3InstalledArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Belisário da Silva:
Archbishop José Belisário da Silva O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of São Luís do Maranhão

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2005
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,698

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013