Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dario Campos, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1948 Born
10 Feb 197526.6Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
8 Dec 197729.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
5 Jul 200052.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Sep 200052.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Aug 200153.1SucceededBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Jun 200456.0AppointedBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
27 Apr 201162.8AppointedBishop of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil
7 Nov 201870.4AppointedArchbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
5 Jan 201970.5InstalledArchbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Dario Campos
Archbishop Dario Campos O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Vitória

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelo
Ordained BishopGinásio Poliesportivo Frei Aristides do Colégio Santo Antônio, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Vitória.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,845
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Nov 2018

Quantcast