Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Vitória

Archidioecesis Victoriensis Spiritus Sancti



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luiz Mancilha Vilela, SS.CC., Archbishop
  • Joaquim Wladimir Lopes Dias, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Rubens Sevilha, O.C.D., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Silvestre Luís Scandián, S.V.D., Archbishop Emeritus
  • José Aparecido Hergesse, C.R., Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 16 February 1958
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Espirito Santo
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 7,234 (2,794 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste II
  • Official Web Site: http://www.aves.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, C.P. 107, Rua Soldado Abilio dos Santos 47, 29015-620 Vitoria, ES, Brazil
  • Telephone: (027)3223-6711
  • Fax: 3223-1227

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Espírito Santo
15 November 1895ErectedDiocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) Diocese of Espírito Santo (erected)
16 February 1958Territory LostDiocese of Espírito Santo Diocese of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim (erected)
16 February 1958Territory LostDiocese of Espírito Santo Diocese of São Mateus (erected)
Archdiocese of Vitória
16 February 1958Name ChangedDiocese of Espírito Santo Archdiocese of Vitória
23 April 1990Territory LostArchdiocese of Vitória Diocese of Colatina (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Espírito Santo
1950730,0003539749,864194339ap1951
Archdiocese of Vitória
1963550,000628,71087.5%3837757,3337823637ap1967
1971771,106.0%34639709723748ap1977
1980909,0001,074,00084.6%252536,3602217943ap1981
19901,536,0541,736,05488.5%39418019,2009414053ap1991
1999939,0001,342,00070.0%37387512,5205422638ap2000
2000903,7731,505,12660.0%44378111,1575216844ap2001
20011,053,5001,505,12670.0%38306815,4923416845ap2002
20021,162,0551,719,26967.6%38458314,0005018742ap2003
20031,162,0551,719,26967.6%40458513,6715018746ap2004
20041,868,7222,983,15062.6%43499220,3125418751ap2005
20102,010,0003,210,00062.6%657313814,5659716764ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Dec 2014