Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zenildo Luiz Pereira da Silva, C.SS.R.

Prelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1968 Born
27 Dec 199729.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
11 Aug 200133.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Feb 201647.7AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil
2 Apr 201647.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil
20 Sep 201749.2SucceededPrelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Zenildo Luiz Pereira da Silva
Bishop Zenildo Luiz Pereira da Silva C.SS.R. (born ) Prelate of Borba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinhares
Ordained BishopSanctuaire de Aparecida, Manaus, Archdiocese of Manaus, Amazonas

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Borba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,886
  • s: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 20 Sep 2017